Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04/28/23 3:45PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 12:35PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 10:25AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 10:25AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-23 10:25AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 864).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Perruso, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Cochran, Evslin, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Kim, Wakai Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 792).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2124), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-03-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from EEP/HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1493) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HET on Tuesday, 03-21-23 11:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EEP/HET, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 475) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1023) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from EET/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to EET/HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|