12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from JDC/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 524) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to JDC/HHS, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |