|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 41).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Dela Cruz, Kidani, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Wakai. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Kim). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-03-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 679) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|