12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Referred to JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Pending Introduction. |