Senate | 02/14/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2309) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 1:30PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Referred to HOU/GVO, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Pending Introduction. |