House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 61) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2860) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 9:46AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2140) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Re-Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Referred to HOU/PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|