Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2640) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Referred to TCA, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Pending Introduction. |