LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB2039
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2039
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2024 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2039
Action History
Senate
02/06/2024
The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Senate
02/01/2024
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-06-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224.
Senate
01/29/2024
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/17/2024
Referred to TCA, CPN.
Senate
01/17/2024
Introduced and passed First Reading.
Senate
01/10/2024
Pending Introduction.