Senate | 02/12/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported from HOU/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Referred to HOU/CPN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Pending Introduction. |