Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2693) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Referred to HOU, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Pending Introduction. |