LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB2089
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2089
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2024 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2089
Action History
Senate
02/07/2024
The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Senate
02/07/2024
The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Senate
02/02/2024
The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/18/2024
Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC.
Senate
01/17/2024
Introduced and passed First Reading.
Senate
01/16/2024
Pending Introduction.