Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from HHS/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Referred to HHS/AEN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Pending Introduction. |