House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 69) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3035) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:50AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2238) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Rhoads; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Re-Referred to AEN, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to AEN, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|