Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2598) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Re-Referred to TCA, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Referred to TCA/PSM, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Pending Introduction. |