Senate | 02/07/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2165) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Fukunaga, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Referred to EET, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Pending Introduction. |