Senate
|
06/28/2024
|
Act 096, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2024
|
Act 096, on 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 31-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 31-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Nakashima, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-24 3:45PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Sayama Chair; Nakashima, Tam, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 355).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 496).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1556-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:05PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CPC, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2771) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2475) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to HHS, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|