12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduced. |