House | 03/07/2024 | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 3). | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, San Buenaventura). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella, Richards). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | One Day Notice 01-31-24. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Introduced. |