Senate | 01/30/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) San Buenaventura; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Introduced. |