House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Elefante.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 355).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 500).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1558-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 87) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2775) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-16-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2109) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|