Senate
|
07/05/2024
|
Act 190, 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2024
|
Act 190, on 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Garcia, Gates, Kila, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 175-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 175-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Nishimoto, Garrett, Holt, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Shimabukuro, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 1:35PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-24 1:35PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-24 1:35PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 1:35PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Garrett, Holt, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Elefante, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 655).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Cochran, Garcia, Gates, Kila, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (10) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1813-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos, Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kong voting no (2) and Representative(s) Amato, Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1204-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Miyake, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-15-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 12) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-20-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2484) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Hashimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-24 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2125) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|