Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2453) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Re-Referred to HHS, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2115) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS will hold a public decision making on 01-29-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Referred to HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|