Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2720) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |