Senate | 02/15/2024 | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-15-24 4:00PM; Conference Room 225. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 4:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Referred to PSM, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |