Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Act 171, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
|
|
|
House
|
07/03/2024
|
Act 171, on 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kila voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 68-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 68-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Tam, Nakashima, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 10:00AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Moriwaki.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Tam Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Onishi, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ganaden, Garcia, Gates voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kila voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-04-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1600-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kila, Souza voting no (2) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Evslin, Miyake, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kila; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aiu, Kitagawa, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 03-12-24 10:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 107) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2969) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-06-24 3:05PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Referred to TCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|