House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 3:30PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 9:15AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 11:00AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 770).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Kim, Aquino Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Kahaloa Co-Chairs; Cochran, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 526).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1618-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:15AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to AGR/HET, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 110) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2779) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2573) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hashimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|