Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2548) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:31PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Referred to AEN, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |