Senate | 02/14/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported from JDC/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2362) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Fevella, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Referred to JDC/LBT, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |