House | 03/08/2024 | Re-referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 19 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 16 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 111). | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Kim, San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | One Day Notice 03-05-24. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2832) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-24 9:32AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |