House
|
04/17/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 690).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Onishi voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1759-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Aiu, Cochran, Lamosao.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1180-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 115).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2989) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-16-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to HHS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|