12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Referred to AEN/GVO, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduced. |