Senate
|
06/28/2024
|
Act 097, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2024
|
Act 097, on 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 33-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 33-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Belatti, Sayama, La Chica, M. Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Keohokalole, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 2:09PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 690).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Hashimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Belatti, Sayama Co-Chairs; La Chica, M. Mizuno, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 563).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-04-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1599-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Sayama excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Reported from EDN/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1162-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Kobayashi, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EDN/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2769) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2334) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 3:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to EDU, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|