Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Failed to pass Final Reading. Ayes, 9. Noes, 15 (Senator(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Fevella, Fukunaga, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, McKelvey, Moriwaki, Richards, Wakai). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Lee).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 705).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-09-24 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Elefante, Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) M. Mizuno, Quinlan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Chun, Garcia, Garrett, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, Lamosao, Martinez, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Onishi, Pierick, Takenouchi, Ward voting no (18) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Chun, Ganaden, La Chica, Martinez, Quinlan, Takenouchi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Garcia, Garrett, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Onishi, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (16) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1636-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, Souza; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Re-referred to JHA, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 125) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2835) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-24 9:30AM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|