House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HLT/LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 126) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2868) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2454) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 02-07-24 1:00PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 1:55PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HHS, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|