Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-24 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Re-Referred to AEN/EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL/HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2136) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL/HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to AEN/EET, WTL/HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|