Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-24 3:30PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 803).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Todd, Poepoe Co-Chairs; La Chica, M. Mizuno, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Hashimoto, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 564).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1777-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Aiu, Cochran, Lamosao.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1282-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Todd, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1124-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to WAL, HET, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 130) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2786) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2445) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|