House
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; McKelvey, Keohokalole, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 565).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1749-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Aiu, Cochran, Lamosao.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1303-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-19-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1073-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to LGO, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 131) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3032) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:50AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from HHS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2581) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 3:45PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HHS/GVO, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|