House
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 10:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 10:34AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 10:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 774).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Garrett, Kila, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 666).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Onishi, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1810-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran, Poepoe; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato, Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Gates, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato, Onishi; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Amato, Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1152-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 03-14-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 139) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2813) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Fukunaga, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|