Senate
|
07/09/2024
|
Act 240, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2024
|
Act 240, on 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 62-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 62-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Rhoads, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 2:05PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; McKelvey, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 355).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 502).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Miyake, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-15-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Re-referred to JHA, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HSG, JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 144) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2968) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-29-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2375) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|