Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from LBT/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2611) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | The committee(s) on LBT/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to LBT/HHS, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |