House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 157).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2880) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2504) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-08-24 3:03PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|