Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 5:20 PM; CR 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 2:45 PM; CR 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 11:15 AM; CR 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 9:02AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 9:00AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 9:00AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 803).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Tarnas, Garrett Co-Chairs; Martinez, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Aquino, Rhoads, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 707).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1831-24) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-24 2:15PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-19-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1094-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to LGO, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 160) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3021) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 10:31AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from GVO/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2701) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Re-Referred to GVO/LBT, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to PSM/LBT, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|