Senate | 02/14/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported from HWN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on HWN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to HWN/EET, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |