House | 03/07/2024 | Referred to JHA/CPC, referral sheet 16 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 174) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2839) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-27-24 9:31AM; Conference Room 016. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Re-Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to GVO, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |