House
|
03/20/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:20PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 179) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2944) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2396) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|