Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Act 050, 06/19/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Act 050, on 06/19/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cochran, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (5) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 115-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 115-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 698).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Wakai, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Kitagawa Chair; Chun, Garrett, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 708).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (4) and Representative(s) Gates, Souza excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1781-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-24 2:15PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 185).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2845) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-24 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|