House
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:20PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 189) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2754) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|