House
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 722).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Kanuha.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 574).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Morikawa, Nakamura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Cochran, Evslin, Garcia, Kapela, Matsumoto, Miyake, Pierick, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-04-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1602-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1224-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-14-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 193) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2774) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2459) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-08-24 3:05PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to TCA, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|