Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Lamosao, Poepoe, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 576).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1764-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Aiu, Cochran, Lamosao.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 196) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2892) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|