Senate | 02/07/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 1:01PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to EET/AEN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |